skip to content

Sawicki, Christian Konrad

CPSO#: 104141

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners Credit Val
Department of Anesthesia
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sawicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sawicki ( CPSO# 95159 )
Dr. C. Sawicki ( CPSO# 104141)

Business Address:
601 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
303 - 27 Roncesvalles Ave.
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 588-5141

Business Address:
202 - 906 Brant St.
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 631-8700


Corporation Name: CK SAWICKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sawicki ( CPSO# 104141)

Business Address:
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN KONRAD SAWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWICKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2014 to 05 Oct 2014
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019