skip to content

Rosen, Cheryl Fern

CPSO#: 51512

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Dermatology Centre
8 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drucker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL FERN ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987