skip to content

Rivest, Candice Dawn

CPSO#: 93012

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex
General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-1550 Ext. 5533 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.D. Rivest Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rivest ( CPSO# 93012 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex
General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CANDICE DAWN RIVEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.