skip to content

Posso De Los Rios, Claudia Jimena

CPSO#: 96168

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Caldas, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gustavo Rubio Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rubio Gomez ( CPSO# 95554 )
Dr. C. Posso De Los Rios ( CPSO# 96168 )

Business Address:
8 - 33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: (519) 836-8558

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M1 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Colombia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 16 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 28 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Claudia Jimena Posso De Los Rios may practise Dermatology in Ontario,
                  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable to the
                  College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires six months from the
                  date of issuance or when Dr. Posso De Los  Rios'  eligibility to take the
                  Royal  College  Physicians  and  Surgeons of Canada examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Posso  De  Los Rios' knowledge, skill, judgment or professionalism,
                        or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Posso De Los Rios' practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  December 31, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.