skip to content

Patel, Chirag Manubhai

CPSO#: 96861

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2013
EXPIRY DATE
07 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Nov 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging MG162
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87596 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Chirag Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite MG162
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 02 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Chirag Manubhai Patel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Patel holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Patel  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Patel's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Patel's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 8, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 7, 2020.