skip to content

O'Connor, Christine Premila

CPSO#: 96128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Feb 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B2W2
Phone: 905-575-5200
Fax: 905-575-5383 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Wronzberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wronzberg ( CPSO# 95884 )
Dr. C. O'Connor ( CPSO# 96128 )

Business Address:
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301


Corporation Name: CHRISTINE O'CONNOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Connor ( CPSO# 96128 )

Business Address:
17 Grassyplain Dr
Mount Hope ON  L0R 1W0

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jan 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PREMILA O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018