skip to content

Logan, Charlotte Ann

CPSO#: 98425

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Jun 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: (226) 783-2273 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

2464 Howard Ave Ste 106
Windsor,ON N8X 3V6
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (226) 782-7246
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )
Dr. C. Logan ( CPSO# 98425 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 782-7246

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2014 Active
 
                  Dr.  Charlotte Ann Logan may practise medicine independently in emergency
                  medicine, only.