skip to content

Lin, Ching-Sheng Brian

CPSO#: 93399

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613)729-8262
Fax: (613)729-7870 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 6137229900
Fax: 6137229100
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brecher Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 93399 )
Dr. E. Brecher ( CPSO# 95729 )

Business Address:
Algonquin College
Health Services, Room C141
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone Number: (613) 727-4723

Business Address:
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3

Business Address:
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-8262

Business Address:
Sexual Health Centre
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHING-SHENG BRIAN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014