skip to content

Lai, Chi Kien

CPSO#: 99148

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chi Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai ( CPSO# 99148 )

Business Address:
St. Paul's Hospital
Department of Pathology
P2013A - 1081 Burrard Street
Vancouver BC  V6Z 1Y6
Phone Number: (604) 682-2344

Medical Records Location

Address: P2013A - 1081 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6Z 1Y6
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020