skip to content

Ho, Chung-Han John

CPSO#: 75256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
Suite C-120
11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone: (416) 368-9990 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. John Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )
Dr. C. Ho ( CPSO# 75256 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
C 120 - 11 King Street
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHUNG-HAN JOHN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002