skip to content

Dey, Chris

CPSO#: 94397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2363 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Dey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:16 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017 Active
             Dr. Chris Dey may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.