skip to content

Davidson, Cara Elizabeth

CPSO#: 88500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Finch, Cara Elizabeth (used until: 26 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cara Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davidson ( CPSO# 88500 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-0800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARA ELIZABETH DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012