skip to content

Brown, Carolyn Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6859
Fax: (705) 740-6881 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Ashbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ashbourne ( CPSO# 31866 )
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 30763 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Haliburton Highland Health Services
6 McPherson Drive
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-0256

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN ELIZABETH BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008