skip to content

Bates, Carol Eleanor

CPSO#: 56723

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical
Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Doherty ( CPSO# 31577 )
Dr. C. Bates ( CPSO# 56723 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103


Corporation Name: Carol E. Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROL ELEANOR BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988