skip to content

Buwan, Hayman Buwaneswaran

CPSO#: 87411

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Oct 2009 to 09 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Oct 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Oct 2015
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Apr 2016
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018