skip to content

Butty, Ziad

CPSO#: 96216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 640-0661
Fax: (416) 640-0664 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building , Unit #308
2238 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 760-8777
Fax: (416) 760-0748
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Clearview Vision Institute
unit 101A
4100 Yonge st
Toronto ON  M2P2B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 289-4000
Fax: (416) 289-2318
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

E wing 6th Floor, Glaucoma Clinic
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035317
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Butty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Butty ( CPSO# 96216 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Ophthalmology
Glaucoma Service
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
101A - 4100 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2B7
Phone Number: (416) 289-2318

Business Address:
One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 640-0661

Business Address:
West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building
Unit 308
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 760-0748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZIAD BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017