skip to content

Butt, Aeysha

CPSO#: 97973

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: Butt, Aeysha Saleem (used until: 26 Mar 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aeysha Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butt ( CPSO# 97973 )

Business Address:
201 - 101 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Y6
Phone Number: (416) 748-2800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AEYSHA BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2019