skip to content

Butler-Jones, David Alexander

CPSO#: 32036

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Nov 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON  K1A0K9
Phone: (613) 960-4480 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective:05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER BUTLER-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER-JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005