skip to content

Butler, William Jonathan

CPSO#: 30663

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 May 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.J. Butler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Mackenzie Health Medical Records 10 Trench St. Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 4Z3
Date Received: 26 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2020