skip to content

Butler, Marcus Otho

CPSO#: 97421

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Apr 2012
EXPIRY DATE
09 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Apr 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Princess Margaret Cancer
Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
OPG 7-815 - 610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5485
Fax: (416) 946-6546 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 03 May 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 09 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Marcus Otho Butler may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Butler holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration will expire on the earlier of the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on April 9, 2020,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Butler no longer holds the academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor in the Department of Medicine, Division
                        of Medical Oncology, or 
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Butler's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.
                  
            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Butler's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 10, 2012. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on April 9, 2020.