skip to content

Butler, Jeremy Ryan

CPSO#: 95830

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6J 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 5632 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pyle ( CPSO# 26697 )
Dr. J. Butler ( CPSO# 95830 )

Business Address:
166 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville ON  L6J 4V1
Phone Number: (905) 466-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:29 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2014 Active
             Dr. Jeremy Ryan Butler may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only