skip to content

Butchey, Robert Satyamurti

CPSO#: 87374

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: (519) 688-1031
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert S. Butchey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butchey ( CPSO# 87374 )

Business Address:
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 0V1
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT SATYAMURTI BUTCHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTCHEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011