skip to content

Butany, Jagdish Washo

CPSO#: 42406

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Sindhi

Education:Mysore University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
E11 - 443
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3003
Fax: (416) 586-9901 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAGDISH WASHO BUTANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTANY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990