Bushehri, Ahmad A R A M (CPSO#: 99891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD A R A M BUSHEHRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUSHEHRI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BUSHEHRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUSHEHRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BUSHEHRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUSHEHRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUSHEHRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 05 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019