skip to content

Bush, Shirley Harvey

CPSO#: 90373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 1060
Fax: (613) 562-6378 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Palliative Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016 Active
                   Dr. Shirley Harvey Bush may practise medicine independently in palliative
                  medicine.