skip to content

Bush, Haydn

CPSO#: 42396

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dynamic Medical Services 42673 Southdale Line St. Thomas ON N5R 1C1
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:20 Mar 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective:14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019