skip to content

Bury, Katherine Diane

CPSO#: 18681

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Bury indicated that all of her patient files are in the custody of the clinic where the patient received care.
Date Received: 22 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013