skip to content

Burt, Benjamin Edward

CPSO#: 95122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
567 Cundles Road East
Second Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 0J7
Phone: (705) 726-4681
Fax: (705) 739-8404 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benjamin E. Burt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burt ( CPSO# 95122 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
567 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 5L1
Phone Number: (705) 726-4681

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN EDWARD BURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013