skip to content

Burrell, John Charles

CPSO#: 29732

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Mar 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 215 North 2300 East Layton UT 84040 United States
Date Received: 05 Jul 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
USA - Utah

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2016