skip to content

Burnstein, Michael Harrison

CPSO#: 28769

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.