skip to content

Burns, David Moses

CPSO#: 97552

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
University of Toronto
149 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: (416) 946-7957 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maarse ( CPSO# 93068 )
Dr. H. Rappaport ( CPSO# 28272 )
Dr. D. Burns ( CPSO# 97552 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID MOSES BURNS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BURNS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BURNS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BURNS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BURNS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BURNS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BURNS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020