skip to content

Burns, Brenda Ruth

CPSO#: 84636

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022
Fax: (705) 876-5075 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 McPherson St
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-2140
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Burns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burns ( CPSO# 84636 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Minden Hospital
6 McPherson Street
PO Box 30
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENDA RUTH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008