skip to content

Burnett, John Allan

CPSO#: 28286

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995