skip to content

Burman, Dmitriy Konstantinovich

CPSO#: 97107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Dec 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Riga Stradins University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
VIP2Care Pediatric Clinic
Unit 204
9983 Keele St
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Phone: (905) 553-8553
Fax: (905) 553-8558 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Burman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burman ( CPSO# 97107 )

Business Address:
204 - 9983 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 553-8553


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2014 Active
             Dr. Dmitriy Konstantinovich Burman may practise paediatrics independently in an
            office based practice only.