skip to content

Burman, Dmitriy Konstantinovich

CPSO#: 97107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Riga Stradins University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
VIP2Care Pediatric Clinic
Unit 204
9983 Keele St
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Phone: (905) 553-8553
Fax: (905) 553-8558 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Burman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burman ( CPSO# 97107 )

Business Address:
204 - 9983 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 553-8553


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2014 Active
 Dr. Dmitriy Konstantinovich Burman may practise paediatrics independently in an
            office based practice only.