skip to content

Burke, Matthew James Magnus

CPSO#: 98188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, FG-26
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804216
Fax: 4164804613 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Burke and Sediqzadah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Burke ( CPSO# 98188 )
Dr. S. Sediqzadah ( CPSO# 105885)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
17th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3088

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-26
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4216

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MAGNUS BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019