skip to content

Burke, Emory

CPSO#: 20895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emory Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Burke ( CPSO# 20895 )

Business Address:
Cardio-Pulmonary Lab
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6064

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 12 Nov 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:13 Mar 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMORY BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1967