skip to content

Burke, Clarissa Ann

CPSO#: 88343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Holding, Clarissa Ann (used until: 18 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E6L9
Phone: (226) 369-0264 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Clarissa Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Burke ( CPSO# 88343 )

Business Address:
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Business Address:
2nd Floor
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (226) 369-0264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLARISSA ANN BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010