skip to content

Buongiorno, Pinella

CPSO#: 95852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platinum Medical Clinic
3170 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: 416-265-6737 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeshore Lodge LTC Facility
3197 Lakeshore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8V 3X5
Canada
Phone: 416-392-9440
Fax: 416-392-9401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

495 The West Mall
The Westbury Long Term Care Facilit
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5S3
Canada
Phone: 416-622-7094
Fax: 416-622-5124
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pinella Buongiorno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Buongiorno ( CPSO# 95852 )

Business Address:
3197 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 3X5
Phone Number: (416) 392-9440

Business Address:
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone Number: (647) 982-7104

Business Address:
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 922-0566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PINELLA BUONGIORNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUONGIORNO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013