Bunn, Shannon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100781)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2016 to 17 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2016 to 10 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2016