skip to content

Bulmer, David Rennie

CPSO#: 28926

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Nov 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Nov 1983