skip to content

Bull, Maurice Henry

CPSO#: 18578

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Feb 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Feb 2001
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1963
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2001

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 13, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bull guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he engaged in acts of sexual impropriety; in that he sexually abused a patient; and, that he 
 engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

The Committee ordered that Dr. Bull be reprimanded and 
 the reprimand be recorded on the register. As well, the Committee ordered his certificate of 
 registration be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 13, 2001