skip to content

Bulatovic-Stajkovic, Sladjana

CPSO#: 90414

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nis, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Serbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 20 Jan 2015
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2017