skip to content

Bukhari, Nedal Ahmed M

CPSO#: 92343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEDAL AHMED M BUKHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 01 Mar 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Mar 2011 to 24 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Mar 2012 to 24 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2019