skip to content

Bukczynski, Jacob M

CPSO#: 90770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 923-5767
Fax: (416) 923-5125 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Golden Mile Medical Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 2L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1500-333 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 364-3008
Fax: (416) 362-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bukczynski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bukczynski ( CPSO# 90770 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 923-5767

Business Address:
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACOB M BUKCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011