skip to content

Buitendyk, Marie

CPSO#: 101214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE BUITENDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUITENDYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 27 Apr 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2018