Bugshan, Ahmed Abdullah S (CPSO#: 99348)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 28 Apr 2015
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 29 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016