skip to content

Buchanan, Ian Mitchell

CPSO#: 95889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Brown University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 38510 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Buchanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Buchanan ( CPSO# 95889 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare-Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1275 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 7K5
Phone Number: (905) 573-4812

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IAN MITCHELL BUCHANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCHANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2020