skip to content

Buchan, Catharine Arianne

CPSO#: 93618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 223
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 798 5555
Fax: 613-737-8164 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHARINE ARIANNE BUCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016