Bubela, Constantine Boris (CPSO#: 31180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Dec 2018

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-3312
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H7K4
Canada
Phone: 905 721-2750
Fax: 905 721-2658
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bubela Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bubela ( CPSO# 31180 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2750

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-2800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 21 Dec 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 21, 2018, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Constantine Boris
            Bubela, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bubela to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CONSTANTINE BUBELA
                                          ("Dr. Bubela")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; and
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bubela, certificate of registration number 31180, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216466 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anaesthesia and
                  pain management practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Bubela, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bubela, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Courses satisfactory to the College in presentation,
                              recognition and management of opioid toxicity;
                  
                        (ii)  Self-study and prepare a report regarding causes and
                              management of chronic hypoxia; and
                  
                        (iii) Review and summarize the relevant clinical practice
                              guidelines.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bubela, undertake to register and complete the indicated
                        courses at the earliest available date.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bubela, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Bubela, undertake to provide to the College written
                        summaries of my learning from the courses, and of the relevant
                        clinical practice guidelines, within three (3) months of completing
                        the courses.  I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its
                        sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bubela
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
                              his anaesthesia and pain management practice.  As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Bubela will engage in professional education in
                                    opioid toxicity and chronic hypoxia.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bubela, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Bubela, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and

                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Bubela, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Bubela, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Constantine Boris Bubela to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 21, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bubela engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his anaesthesia and pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Bubela will engage in professional education in opioid toxicity and chronic hypoxia.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On August 17, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Bubela.